Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB7
Introduced on: Dec 11, 2006
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Wiener , Horne
Establishes civil liability for certain acts involving the use of controlled substances and the consumption of alcoholic beverages. (BDR 3-53)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 172.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Feb. 08, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Assembly Judiciary     May. 03, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Judiciary     May. 16, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Do pass .
       
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Apr. 18   Yea 19,   Nay 2,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    May. 21   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint                         As Enrolled        
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 257

Bill History

Dec 11, 2006

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Dec 13, 2006

  • From printer.

Feb 05, 2007

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 13, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 16, 2007

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 257.) To printer.

Apr 17, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 18, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 19, Nays: 2.) To Assembly.

Apr 19, 2007

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 16, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 17, 2007

  • Read second time.

May 21, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

May 22, 2007

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 23, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 29, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor.

May 30, 2007

  • Chapter 172.
  • Effective October 1, 2007.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo