Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB68
Introduced on: Feb 02, 2007
By: Health and Human Services
Revises provisions governing the operation of certain medical and care facilities and agencies. (BDR 40-505)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 201.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Feb. 12, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Feb. 21, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Human Resources and Education     Apr. 18, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Human Resources and Education     May. 11, 2007 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
       
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr. 12   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May. 17   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint                 As Enrolled        
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 8
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 704

Bill History

Feb 02, 2007

  • Prefiled.
  • Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Feb 04, 2007

  • From printer.

Feb 05, 2007

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 05, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 09, 2007

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 8.) To printer.

Apr 10, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.

Apr 12, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

Apr 13, 2007

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Human Resources and Education. To committee.

May 15, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 16, 2007

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 704.) To printer.

May 17, 2007

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

May 21, 2007

  • In Assembly.

May 24, 2007

  • Senate Amendment No. 704 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 25, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 30, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 201.
  • Effective July 1, 2007.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo