Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB64
Introduced on: Feb 02, 2007
By: Human Resources and Education
Expands the use of certain allocations made from the Fund for a Healthy Nevada. (BDR 40-240)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Senate Human Resources and Education     Feb. 23, 2007     08:30 AM    Minutes      Do pass .
  Senate Human Resources and Education     May. 23, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      After Passage Discussion .
       
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Mar. 01   Yea 15,   Nay 5,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced                                    

Bill History

Feb 02, 2007

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Human Resources and Education. To printer.

Feb 05, 2007

  • From printer.
  • Read first time. To committee.

Feb 26, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.

Feb 28, 2007

  • Read second time.

Mar 01, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 15, Nays: 5, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.

Mar 02, 2007

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 19, 2007

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo