Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB66
Introduced on: Feb 02, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Care
Increases the amount of damages that may be awarded in certain tort actions brought against a governmental entity or its officers or employees. (BDR 3-120)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Bill read. Veto sustained. (Yeas: 8, Nays: 13.)

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Feb. 15, 2007     08:30 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Judiciary     Feb. 27, 2007     09:00 AM    Minutes      Do pass .
  Senate Finance     Mar. 09, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Discussed in Subcommittee .
  Senate Finance     Mar. 14, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Mentioned No Jurisdiction .
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar. 21, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Not Heard .
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar. 22, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar. 23, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Do pass .
  Senate Finance     May. 03, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Discussed in Subcommittee .
  Assembly Ways and Means     May. 14, 2007     09:00 AM    Minutes      Do pass .
       
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Mar. 07   Yea 14,   Nay 7,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    May. 22   Yea 29,   Nay 13,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    Jun. 04   Yea 8,   Nay 13,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced                             As Enrolled        

Bill History

Feb 02, 2007

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Feb 05, 2007

  • From printer.
  • Read first time. To committee.

Feb 28, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 01, 2007

  • Read second time.

Mar 05, 2007

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Mar 06, 2007

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Mar 07, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 14, Nays: 7.) To Assembly.

Mar 08, 2007

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

Mar 26, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 28, 2007

  • Taken from Second Reading File.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.

May 14, 2007

  • Notice of exemption.

May 15, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 16, 2007

  • Read second time.

May 17, 2007

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 21, 2007

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 22, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 29, Nays: 13.) To Senate.

May 23, 2007

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 24, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 30, 2007

  • Vetoed by the Governor. Returned to Senate with Governor's veto message.

Jun 04, 2007

  • Made Special Order of Business for Monday, June 4, 2007, at 12:30 p.m..
  • Bill read. Veto sustained. (Yeas: 8, Nays: 13.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo