Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB2
Introduced on: Dec 12, 2006
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Anderson
Revises provisions relating to automotive repairs. (BDR 52-92)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 78.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Feb. 07, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Feb. 28, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar. 23, 2007 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May. 03, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May. 04, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
       
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr. 13   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May. 14   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint                 As Enrolled        
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 145
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 679

Bill History

Dec 12, 2006

  • Prefiled.
  • Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Dec 13, 2006

  • From printer.

Feb 05, 2007

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 12, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 145.) To printer.

Apr 13, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

Apr 16, 2007

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 08, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 09, 2007

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 679.) To printer.

May 10, 2007

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 14, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.

May 15, 2007

  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment No. 679 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 16, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 21, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 78.
  • Effective October 1, 2007.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo