Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AJR1** of the 22nd Special Session
Introduced on: Feb 06, 2007
By: Committee of the Whole
Proposes to amend Nevada Constitution to revise provisions governing petition for initiative or referendum. (BDR C-0014)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     Apr. 10, 2007     03:45 PM    Minutes      Do pass .
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May. 10, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
       
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr. 16   Yea 41,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced                                    

Bill History

Feb 06, 2007

  • Returned from Secretary of State.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments. To printer.
  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 12, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

Apr 13, 2007

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 16, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: 1.) To Senate.

Apr 17, 2007

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.

May 19, 2007

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo