Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB74
Introduced on: Feb 08, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
McGinness
Revises provisions governing expenditure of money in infrastructure fund of certain counties. (BDR 32-255)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 177.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Senate Taxation     Feb. 22, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Taxation     Mar. 06, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Finance     Apr. 11, 2007     07:30 AM    Minutes      Mentioned No Jurisdiction .
  Assembly Taxation     May. 03, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Taxation     May. 17, 2007     01:00 PM    Minutes      Do pass .
  Senate Finance     May. 25, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      After Passage Discussion .
       
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Apr. 18   Yea 20,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    May. 22   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint                         As Enrolled        
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 271

Bill History

Feb 08, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Feb 09, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 16, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 17, 2007

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 271.) To printer.

Apr 18, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.) To Assembly.

Apr 19, 2007

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To committee.

May 21, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 22, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

May 23, 2007

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 24, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 29, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor.

May 30, 2007

  • Chapter 177.
  • Effective July 1, 2007.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo