Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB80
Introduced on: Feb 08, 2007
By: Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments
Requires certain business entities that engage in certain political activities to register with the Secretary of State. (BDR 24-170)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 267.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     Feb. 06, 2007     03:45 PM    Minutes      Discussed as BDR .
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     Feb. 20, 2007     03:45 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Mar. 01, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      Mentioned No Jurisdiction .
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     Mar. 20, 2007     03:45 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May. 03, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May. 10, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May. 15, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
       
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr. 23   Yea 32,   Nay 10,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May. 24   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint                 As Enrolled        
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 537
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 801

Bill History

Feb 08, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments. To printer.

Feb 09, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 16, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Taken from Second Reading File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

Apr 20, 2007

  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 537.) To printer.

Apr 23, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 32, Nays: 10.) To Senate.

Apr 24, 2007

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.

May 23, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 801.) To printer.

May 24, 2007

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

May 25, 2007

  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment No. 801 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 28, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 01, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 267.
  • Effective October 1, 2007.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo