Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB84
Introduced on: Feb 09, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Hogan , Munford , Bobzien , Claborn , Koivisto , Womack
Revises provisions relating to the expiration date specified on the label of the container for a prescription drug. (BDR 54-200)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar. 07, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar. 23, 2007 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      Not Heard .
       
 
Votes
 
Bill Text  As Introduced                                    

Bill History

Feb 09, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Feb 12, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 14, 2007

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | Current NELIS | Previous NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2014 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo