Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB78
Introduced on: Feb 12, 2007
By: Legislative Operations and Elections
Revises the provisions relating to misconduct in the signing or filing of petitions. (BDR 15-770)
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 227.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Feb. 13, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Mar. 01, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      Do pass .
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     May. 01, 2007     03:45 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     May. 15, 2007     03:45 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
       
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Mar. 07   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    May. 23   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint                         As Enrolled        
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 768

Bill History

Feb 12, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Feb 13, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 05, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 06, 2007

  • Read second time.

Mar 07, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

Mar 08, 2007

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments. To committee.

May 22, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 768.) To printer.

May 23, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.

May 24, 2007

  • In Senate.

May 25, 2007

  • Assembly Amendment No. 768 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 28, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 31, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 227.
  • Effective October 1, 2007.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo