Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB6
Introduced on: Dec 12, 2006
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Hardy
Authorizes a board of county commissioners to enter into a contract or contracts to provide the residents of the county with discounts on prescription drugs. (BDR 20-530)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 117.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Government Affairs     Feb. 16, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Government Affairs     Feb. 19, 2007     09:00 AM    Minutes      Not Heard .
  Assembly Government Affairs     Feb. 26, 2007     10:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Human Resources and Education     Apr. 30, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Human Resources and Education     May. 11, 2007 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      Do pass .
       
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr. 18   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May. 17   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint                         As Enrolled        
Adopted Amendments Amend. No.12

Bill History

Dec 12, 2006

  • Prefiled.
  • Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Dec 13, 2006

  • From printer.

Feb 05, 2007

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 17, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 12.) To printer.

Apr 18, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.

Apr 19, 2007

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Human Resources and Education. To committee.

May 14, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 15, 2007

  • Read second time.

May 16, 2007

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 17, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

May 21, 2007

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 22, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 25, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 117.
  • Effective May 25, 2007.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | Current NELIS | Previous NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2014 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo