Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB88
Introduced on: Feb 12, 2007
By: Commerce and Labor
Revises provisions governing the collection of debts by collection agencies. (BDR 54-630)
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
First Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To committee.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Feb. 09, 2007 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      Discussed as BDR .
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Feb. 19, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr. 06, 2007     12:00 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May. 01, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Assigned to Subcommittee .
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May. 04, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Jun. 02, 2007 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      Do not recede .
       
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr. 17   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May. 15   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint                        
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 282
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 678

Bill History

Feb 12, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Feb 13, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 16, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 282.) To printer.

Apr 17, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

Apr 18, 2007

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 10, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 14, 2007

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 678.) To printer.

May 15, 2007

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

May 16, 2007

  • In Assembly.

May 21, 2007

  • Senate Amendment No. 678 not concurred in. To Senate.

May 22, 2007

  • In Senate.

Jun 03, 2007

  • Senate Amendment No. 678 not receded from. Conference requested. First Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • First Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To committee.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo