Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB82
Introduced on: Feb 12, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Titus , Wiener , Care , Carlton , Coffin , Horsford , Lee , Mathews , Schneider , Woodhouse
Provides that price gouging during an emergency constitutes a deceptive trade practice. (BDR 52-31)
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Feb. 14, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Subcommittee .
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Feb. 19, 2007     09:30 AM    Minutes      Discussed in Subcommittee .
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Feb. 22, 2007     09:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
       
 
Votes
 
Bill Text  As Introduced                                    

Bill History

Feb 12, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Feb 13, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 14, 2007

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo