Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB7
Introduced on: Dec 12, 2006
By: Commerce and Labor
Provides that certain public utilities have the burden of proving that costs sought to be recovered in deferred accounting proceedings were the result of reasonable and prudent practices and transactions. (BDR 58-280)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 163.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar. 07, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May. 08, 2007     07:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May. 15, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Do pass .
       
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr. 13   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May. 22   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint                         As Enrolled        
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 134

Bill History

Dec 12, 2006

  • Prefiled.
  • Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Dec 13, 2006

  • From printer.

Feb 05, 2007

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 12, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 134.) To printer.

Apr 13, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

Apr 16, 2007

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 16, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 17, 2007

  • Read second time.

May 22, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 23, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 29, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor.

May 30, 2007

  • Chapter 163.
  • Effective May 29, 2007.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo