Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB85
Introduced on: Feb 13, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Raggio , Cegavske , Hardy , Beers , Care , Amodei , Carlton , Coffin , Heck , Horsford , Lee , Mathews , McGinness , Nolan , Rhoads , Schneider , Titus , Townsend , Washington , Wiener , Woodhouse
Makes various changes to provisions relating to eminent domain. (BDR 3-9)
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Feb. 28, 2007     09:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Judiciary     Apr. 10, 2007     09:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Assembly Judiciary     May. 02, 2007     09:07 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Judiciary     May. 16, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
       
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Apr. 18   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint                                
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 268

Bill History

Feb 13, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Feb 14, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 16, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 17, 2007

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 268.) To printer.

Apr 18, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

Apr 19, 2007

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 19, 2007

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo