Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB92
Introduced on: Feb 15, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Lee , Hardy , Heck , Beers , Cegavske , Care , Coffin , McGinness , Woodhouse , Anderson , Parks , Gansert , Allen , Mortenson , Beers , Bobzien , Christensen , Claborn , Denis , Goicoechea , Grady , Hardy , Koivisto , Manendo , Marvel , Ohrenschall , Settelmeyer , Stewart
Revises certain provisions pertaining to the regulation of firearms by local governments. (BDR 20-45)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 320.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Senate Government Affairs     Mar. 14, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Government Affairs     Mar. 30, 2007     11:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Government Affairs     Apr. 09, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Assembly Government Affairs     May. 10, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Government Affairs     May. 16, 2007     08:30 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Government Affairs     May. 28, 2007     01:00 PM    Minutes      Concur .
       
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Apr. 23   Yea 20,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    May. 24   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint                 As Enrolled        
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 244
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 789

Bill History

Feb 15, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Feb 16, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 19, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 23, 2007

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 244.) To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.) To Assembly.

Apr 24, 2007

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 23, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 789.) To printer.

May 24, 2007

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

May 25, 2007

  • In Senate.

May 29, 2007

  • Assembly Amendment No. 789 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 30, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 04, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 320.
  • Effective October 1, 2007.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | Current NELIS | Previous NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2016 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo