Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB114
Introduced on: Feb 15, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Pierce , Conklin , Parks , Allen , Anderson , Arberry , Atkinson , Bobzien , Buckley , Claborn , Denis , Gansert , Gerhardt , Hogan , Horne , Kihuen , Kirkpatrick , Leslie , Mabey , Manendo , Munford , Oceguera , Ohrenschall , Parnell , Segerblom , Smith , Stewart , Womack
Makes various changes concerning the protection of personal identifying information. (BDR 8-406)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 23.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Feb. 23, 2007 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr. 02, 2007     01:00 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Judiciary     Apr. 25, 2007     09:00 AM    Minutes      Do pass .
       
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr. 13   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    Apr. 30   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint                         As Enrolled        
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 141

Bill History

Feb 15, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Feb 16, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 12, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 141.) To printer.

Apr 13, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

Apr 16, 2007

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

Apr 25, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 26, 2007

  • Read second time.

Apr 30, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

May 01, 2007

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 03, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 07, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor.

May 08, 2007

  • Chapter 23.
  • Effective October 1, 2007.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo