Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB115
Introduced on: Feb 15, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Leslie
Enacts provisions governing mines. (BDR 46-858)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 534.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar. 26, 2007     01:00 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr. 09, 2007     01:00 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Assembly Ways and Means     May. 03, 2007     03:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Ways and Means     May. 04, 2007     09:00 AM    Minutes      Do pass, as amended .
  Senate Natural Resources     May. 14, 2007     03:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Natural Resources     May. 16, 2007     03:30 PM    Minutes      Do pass .
       
 
Votes (2/3 Majority Required)
  Assembly Final Passage    May. 08   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    Jun. 04   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint                         As Enrolled        
Adopted Amendments Amend. No.530

Bill History

Feb 15, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Feb 16, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 12, 2007

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 23, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 530.) To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

May 07, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass, as amended.

May 08, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

May 09, 2007

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To committee.

May 17, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 22, 2007

  • Read second time.

May 23, 2007

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 24, 2007

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 25, 2007

  • Read third time.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 26, 2007

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 29, 2007

  • Read third time.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.

Jun 04, 2007

  • Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

Jun 05, 2007

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

Jun 07, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 14, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor.

Jun 15, 2007

  • Chapter 534.
  • Effective June 14, 2007.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2014 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo