Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB99
Introduced on: Feb 15, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Hardy
Revises provisions concerning consolidated insurance programs. (BDR 53-1010)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 179.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Feb. 27, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Mar. 07, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Do pass .
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr. 16, 2007 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May. 14, 2007     01:00 PM    Minutes      Do pass .
       
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Mar. 12   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    May. 22   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced                             As Enrolled        

Bill History

Feb 15, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Feb 16, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 07, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 08, 2007

  • Read second time.

Mar 12, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

Mar 13, 2007

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 15, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 16, 2007

  • Read second time.

May 17, 2007

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 21, 2007

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 22, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

May 23, 2007

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 24, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 29, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor.

May 30, 2007

  • Chapter 179.
  • Effective July 1, 2007.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo