Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB118
Introduced on: Feb 15, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Denis , Conklin , Anderson , Claborn , Hardy , Horne , Kihuen , Kirkpatrick , Manendo , Mortenson , Pierce , Segerblom , Smith , Womack , Beers , Hardy
Requires the Department of Transportation to erect advisory signs on certain highways designating the lane in which certain larger vehicles should travel. (BDR 43-762)
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 84.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Transportation     Feb. 27, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Transportation     Mar. 20, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Transportation and Homeland Security     May. 03, 2007     02:30 PM    Minutes      Do pass .
       
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr. 18   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May. 14   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint                         As Enrolled        
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 277

Bill History

Feb 15, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Feb 16, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 17, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 277.) To printer.

Apr 18, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.

Apr 19, 2007

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation and Homeland Security. To committee.

May 07, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 08, 2007

  • Read second time.

May 09, 2007

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 10, 2007

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 14, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.

May 15, 2007

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 16, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 21, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 84.
  • Effective October 1, 2007.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo