Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB104
Introduced on: Feb 19, 2007
By: Legislative Operations and Elections
Revises provisions relating to the effective date of certain legislation. (BDR 17-481)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Feb. 20, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May. 29, 2007     03:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May. 31, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      Rescind previous action on: 5-29-07 .
       
 
Votes
 
Bill Text  As Introduced                                    

Bill History

Feb 19, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Feb 20, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Jun 05, 2007

  • (No further action taken.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo