Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB108
Introduced on: Feb 19, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Beers
Provides for the use of zero-based budgeting in the state budget process. (BDR 31-476)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Senate Finance     Mar. 19, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Finance     Jun. 03, 2007     10:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Assembly Ways and Means     Jun. 04, 2007     02:45 PM    Minutes      No Action .
       
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Jun. 04   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint                                
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 1151

Bill History

Feb 19, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Feb 20, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 18, 2007

  • Notice of exemption.

Jun 04, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1151.) To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.

Jun 05, 2007

  • (No further action taken.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo