Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AJR2
Introduced on: Feb 19, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Ohrenschall , Horne , Buckley , Carpenter , Gerhardt , Hogan , Mabey , Manendo , Munford , Pierce , Segerblom , Settelmeyer , Womack
Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to prohibit the taking of private property for any private use. (BDR C-22)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     Mar. 01, 2007     03:45 PM    Minutes      Indefinitely Postponed .
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     Mar. 22, 2007     03:45 PM    Minutes      Do pass .
       
 
Votes
 
Bill Text  As Introduced                                    

Bill History

Feb 19, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments. To printer.

Feb 20, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 23, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 26, 2007

  • Read second time.

Mar 28, 2007

  • Taken from General File.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments. To committee.

Apr 14, 2007

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo