Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB14
Introduced on: Jan 16, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
McGinness
Prohibits a minor from committing certain acts relating to the possession and use of tobacco products. (BDR 5-76)
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Feb. 08, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Judiciary     Feb. 27, 2007     09:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Judiciary     Mar. 12, 2007     09:30 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Judiciary     Mar. 22, 2007     09:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr. 27, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
       
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Apr. 11   Yea 14,   Nay 6,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint                                
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 58

Bill History

Jan 16, 2007

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Jan 17, 2007

  • From printer.

Feb 05, 2007

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 09, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 10, 2007

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 58.) To printer.

Apr 11, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 14, Nays: 6, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.

Apr 12, 2007

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 19, 2007

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo