Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB127
Introduced on: Feb 20, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Smith , Parks , Leslie , Koivisto , Conklin , Atkinson , Bobzien , Buckley , Claborn , Denis , Hogan , Horne , Kihuen , Kirkpatrick , Manendo , McClain , Mortenson , Oceguera , Ohrenschall , Parnell , Pierce , Segerblom , Womack
Revises provisions relating to the collection of debts by collection agencies. (BDR 54-1049)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 471.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar. 07, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar. 30, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Do pass .
  Senate Judiciary     Apr. 27, 2007     09:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Judiciary     May. 02, 2007     09:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Judiciary     May. 15, 2007     09:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Judiciary     May. 16, 2007     08:30 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
       
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr. 16   Yea 28,   Nay 14,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May. 25   Yea 20,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint                 As Enrolled        
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 792
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. CA28

Bill History

Feb 20, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Feb 21, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 02, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 03, 2007

  • Read second time.

Apr 05, 2007

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

Apr 16, 2007

  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 14.) To Senate.

Apr 17, 2007

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 22, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 23, 2007

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 792.) To printer.

May 24, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.

May 25, 2007

  • Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.) To Assembly.

May 26, 2007

  • In Assembly.

May 28, 2007

  • Senate Amendment No. 792 not concurred in. To Senate.

May 29, 2007

  • In Senate.

May 31, 2007

  • Senate Amendment No. 792 not receded from. Conference requested. First Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To Assembly.

Jun 01, 2007

  • In Assembly.
  • First Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To committee.

Jun 04, 2007

  • From committee: Concur in Senate Amendment No. 792 and further amend. First Conference report adopted by Assembly.
  • First Conference report adopted by Senate.
  • To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
  • To enrollment.

Jun 07, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 13, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor.

Jun 14, 2007

  • Chapter 471.
  • Sections 3.5 to 6, inclusive, 8, 9, and 10 of this act effective June 13, 2007. Section 7 of this act effective January 1, 2008.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo