Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB128
Introduced on: Feb 20, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Conklin , Buckley , Anderson , Horne , Parks , Bobzien , Claborn , Denis , Gerhardt , Hogan , Kirkpatrick , Koivisto , Leslie , Manendo , Mortenson , Munford , Pierce , Segerblom , Smith , Titus , Carlton
Revises provisions relating to prescription drugs. (BDR  54-108)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 409.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar. 12, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar. 23, 2007 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Assembly Ways and Means     May. 03, 2007     03:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Ways and Means     May. 10, 2007     03:30 PM    Minutes      Do pass, as amended .
  Assembly Ways and Means     May. 14, 2007     09:00 AM    Minutes      Rescind previous action on: 5-10-07 .   Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May. 25, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May. 29, 2007     04:00 PM    Minutes      Do pass .
       
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    May. 22   Yea 41,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May. 31   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint                 As Enrolled        
Adopted Amendments Amend. No.140
Adopted Amendments Amend. No.726

Bill History

Feb 20, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Feb 21, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 12, 2007

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 12, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 140.) To printer.

Apr 13, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

May 17, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 21, 2007

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 726.) To printer.

May 22, 2007

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: 1.) To Senate.

May 23, 2007

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 31, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

Jun 01, 2007

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

Jun 02, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 13, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor.

Jun 14, 2007

  • Chapter 409.
  • Effective October 1, 2007.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2014 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo