Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB119
Introduced on: Feb 20, 2007
By: Commerce and Labor
Makes various changes to provisions relating to benefits for certain workers with injuries. (BDR 53-257)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Feb. 27, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Mar. 07, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Mar. 21, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Do pass .
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr. 16, 2007 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      No Action .
       
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Mar. 28   Yea 11,   Nay 10,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced                                    

Bill History

Feb 20, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Feb 21, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 22, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 26, 2007

  • Read second time.

Mar 27, 2007

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Mar 28, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 11, Nays: 10.) To Assembly.

Mar 29, 2007

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 19, 2007

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo