Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
ACR6
Introduced on: Feb 20, 2007
By: Education
Urges the boards of trustees of school districts and the Nevada System of Higher Education to expand certain programs of career and technical education. (BDR R-442)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government:
Effect on State:
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
File No. 82.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Education     Feb. 19, 2007     03:45 PM    Minutes      Discussed as BDR .
  Assembly Education     Mar. 21, 2007     03:45 PM    Minutes      Be adopted .
  Senate Human Resources and Education     Apr. 30, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Human Resources and Education     May. 11, 2007 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      Be adopted .
       
 
Votes
 
Bill Text  As Introduced                             As Enrolled        

Bill History

Feb 20, 2007

  • Resolution read. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Feb 21, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 23, 2007

  • From committee: Be adopted.

Mar 26, 2007

  • Resolution read and adopted. To Senate.

Mar 27, 2007

  • In Senate.
  • Resolution read. Referred to Committee on Human Resources and Education. To committee.

May 14, 2007

  • From committee: Be adopted.

May 15, 2007

  • Resolution read and adopted. To Assembly.

May 16, 2007

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 17, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State.
  • File No. 82.
  • This resolution becomes effective upon passage.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo