Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB131
Introduced on: Feb 20, 2007
By: Education
Revises provisions governing career and technical education. (BDR 34-439)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 120.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Education     Feb. 19, 2007     03:45 PM    Minutes      Discussed as BDR .
  Assembly Education     Feb. 28, 2007     03:45 PM    Minutes      Do pass .
  Assembly Ways and Means     Mar. 19, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr. 30, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Do pass .
  Senate Human Resources and Education     May. 11, 2007 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      Do pass .
       
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    May. 03   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May. 17   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced                             As Enrolled        

Bill History

Feb 20, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Concurrent Committees on Education and Ways and Means. To printer.

Feb 21, 2007

  • From printer. To committees.

Mar 01, 2007

  • From Concurrent Committee on Education: Do pass.
  • To Concurrent Committee on Ways and Means.

Mar 12, 2007

  • Notice of exemption.

Apr 30, 2007

  • From Concurrent Committee on Ways and Means: Do pass.

May 01, 2007

  • Read second time.

May 03, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

May 07, 2007

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Human Resources and Education. To committee.

May 14, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 15, 2007

  • Read second time.

May 16, 2007

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 17, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

May 21, 2007

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 22, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 25, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 120.
  • Effective July 1, 2007.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo