Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SJR3
Introduced on: Feb 20, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Rhoads , Amodei , McGinness
Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to revise certain provisions relating to elections. (BDR C-260)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
File No. 105.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Apr. 03, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Apr. 12, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     May. 03, 2007     03:45 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     May. 17, 2007     03:45 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May. 29, 2007     03:30 PM    Minutes      Concur .
       
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Apr. 24   Yea 20,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    May. 25   Yea 41,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint                 As Enrolled        
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 467
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 923

Bill History

Feb 20, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Feb 21, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 23, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 467.) To printer.

Apr 24, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.) To Assembly.

Apr 25, 2007

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments. To committee.

May 24, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 923.) To printer.

May 25, 2007

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: 1.) To Senate.

May 26, 2007

  • In Senate.

May 30, 2007

  • Assembly Amendment No. 923 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 31, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State.
  • File No. 105.
  • (Return to 2009 Session)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo