Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB16
Introduced on: Jan 16, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Care
Revises the provisions pertaining to eminent domain. (BDR 3-121)
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 226.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Feb. 28, 2007     09:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Judiciary     Mar. 12, 2007     09:30 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Assembly Judiciary     May. 02, 2007     09:07 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Judiciary     May. 16, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
       
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Apr. 09   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    May. 22   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint                 As Enrolled        
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 36
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 795

Bill History

Jan 16, 2007

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Jan 17, 2007

  • From printer.

Feb 05, 2007

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 04, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 05, 2007

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 36.) To printer.

Apr 06, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.

Apr 09, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.

Apr 12, 2007

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 21, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 795.) To printer.

May 22, 2007

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

May 23, 2007

  • In Senate.

May 25, 2007

  • Assembly Amendment No. 795 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 28, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 31, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 226.
  • Effective May 31, 2007.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo