Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB142
Introduced on: Feb 21, 2007
By: Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments
Makes various changes concerning ethics in government. (BDR 23-169)
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     Feb. 20, 2007     03:45 PM    Minutes      Discussed as BDR .
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     Mar. 06, 2007     03:45 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Finance     Apr. 04, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Mentioned No Jurisdiction .
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     Apr. 05, 2007     03:45 PM    Minutes      Not Heard .
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     Apr. 12, 2007     03:45 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May. 03, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May. 15, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May. 29, 2007     03:30 PM    Minutes      Do not recede .
       
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr. 24   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May. 24   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint                        
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 512
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 800

Bill History

Feb 21, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments. To printer.

Feb 22, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 12, 2007

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 23, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 512.) To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

Apr 24, 2007

  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

Apr 25, 2007

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.

May 23, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 800.) To printer.

May 24, 2007

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

May 25, 2007

  • In Assembly.

May 26, 2007

  • Senate Amendment No. 800 not concurred in. To Senate.

May 29, 2007

  • In Senate.

May 30, 2007

  • Senate Amendment No. 800 not receded from. Conference requested. First Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To Assembly.

May 31, 2007

  • In Assembly.

Jun 02, 2007

  • First Conference Committee appointed by Assembly.
  • To committee.

Jun 05, 2007

  • (No further action taken.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo