Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB145
Introduced on: Feb 22, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Hardy
Revises provisions governing the assignment of benefits for health insurance. (BDR 40-1068)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 221.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar. 19, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr. 13, 2007     12:00 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May. 03, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May. 16, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May. 17, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
       
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr. 23   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May. 24   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint     3rd Reprint             As Enrolled        
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 441
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 593
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 855

Bill History

Feb 22, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Feb 23, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 18, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 441.) To printer.

Apr 19, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

Apr 23, 2007

  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 593.) To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

Apr 24, 2007

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 23, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 855.) To printer.

May 24, 2007

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

May 25, 2007

  • In Assembly.

May 26, 2007

  • Senate Amendment No. 855 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 28, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 31, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 221.
  • Effective October 1, 2007.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo