Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB148
Introduced on: Feb 22, 2007
By: Health and Human Services
Makes various changes relating to methamphetamine and other controlled substances. (BDR 40-512)
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 518.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Feb. 21, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      Discussed as BDR .
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Mar. 19, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Mar. 28, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Human Resources and Education     Apr. 18, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Human Resources and Education     May. 02, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
       
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr. 12   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May. 25   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint     3rd Reprint             As Enrolled        
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 123
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 669
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. CA4

Bill History

Feb 22, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Feb 23, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 05, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 09, 2007

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 123.) To printer.

Apr 10, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.

Apr 12, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

Apr 13, 2007

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Human Resources and Education. To committee.

May 09, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 10, 2007

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 669.) To printer.

May 11, 2007

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.

May 14, 2007

  • Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.

May 24, 2007

  • Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 25, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

May 26, 2007

  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment No. 669 not concurred in. To Senate.

May 29, 2007

  • In Senate.

May 30, 2007

  • Senate Amendment No. 669 not receded from. Conference requested. First Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To Assembly.

May 31, 2007

  • In Assembly.
  • First Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To committee.

Jun 01, 2007

  • From committee: Concur in Senate Amendment No. 669 and further amend.
  • First Conference report adopted by Assembly.
  • First Conference report adopted by Senate.
  • To printer.

Jun 02, 2007

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint.
  • To enrollment.

Jun 04, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 14, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 518.
  • Effective August 1, 2007.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | Current NELIS | Previous NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2016 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo