Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB149
Introduced on: Feb 22, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Leslie , Anderson , Horne , Smith , Pierce , Arberry , Bobzien , Conklin , Gansert , Hardy , Hogan , Kirkpatrick , McClain , Parks , Parnell , Stewart , Womack
Makes an appropriation to the Division of Mental Health and Developmental Services in the Department of Health and Human Services for the prevention of the abuse of methamphetamine. (BDR S-1038)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Contains Appropriation not included in Executive Budget.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Mar. 19, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Mar. 21, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      Do pass .
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr. 02, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Ways and Means     May. 17, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
       
 
Votes
 
Bill Text  As Introduced                                    

Bill History

Feb 22, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Concurrent Committees on Health and Human Services and Ways and Means. To printer.

Feb 23, 2007

  • From printer. To committees.

Mar 12, 2007

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Mar 23, 2007

  • From Concurrent Committee on Health and Human Services: Do pass.
  • To Concurrent Committee on Ways and Means.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 05, 2007

  • (No further action taken.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo