Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB150
Introduced on: Feb 22, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Anderson , Buckley , Oceguera , Leslie , Conklin , Allen , Arberry , Atkinson , Beers , Bobzien , Carpenter , Christensen , Claborn , Cobb , Denis , Gansert , Gerhardt , Goedhart , Goicoechea , Grady , Hardy , Hogan , Horne , Kihuen , Kirkpatrick , Koivisto , Mabey , Manendo , Marvel , McClain , Mortenson , Munford , Ohrenschall , Parks , Parnell , Pierce , Segerblom , Settelmeyer , Smith , Stewart , Weber , Womack , Raggio , Titus , Amodei , Care , Washington , Lee , Mathews , McGinness , Nolan , Rhoads , Schneider , Townsend , Wiener , Woodhouse
Makes various changes pertaining to methamphetamine and other controlled substances. (BDR 40-667)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Read third time. Lost. (Yeas: 27, Nays: 14, Not voting: 1.)

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Mar. 19, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Mar. 28, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr. 11, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Assembly Ways and Means     May. 04, 2007     10:30 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Ways and Means     May. 10, 2007     03:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
       
 
Votes (2/3 Majority Required)
  Assembly Final Passage    May. 22   Yea 27,   Nay 14,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 1,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint                        
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 481
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 718

Bill History

Feb 22, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Feb 23, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 12, 2007

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 23, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 481.) To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

May 15, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 16, 2007

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 718.) To printer.

May 17, 2007

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 21, 2007

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 22, 2007

  • Read third time. Lost. (Yeas: 27, Nays: 14, Not voting: 1.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo