Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB141
Introduced on: Feb 22, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Raggio , Townsend , Mathews , Washington , Anderson , Marvel , Leslie , Bobzien , Gansert , Smith
Contingently imposes or increases the rate of certain taxes in certain counties to fund capital projects for the county school district. (BDR 32-757)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Senate Taxation     Mar. 27, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Taxation     Apr. 12, 2007     01:00 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
       
 
Votes (2/3 Majority Required)
  Senate Final Passage    Apr. 24   Yea 8,   Nay 13,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint     3rd Reprint                    
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 407
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 575
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 629

Bill History

Feb 22, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Feb 23, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 17, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 18, 2007

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 407.) To printer.

Apr 19, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 23, 2007

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 575.) To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 24, 2007

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 629.) To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Lost. (Yeas: 8, Nays: 13.)

Apr 25, 2007

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo