Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB151
Introduced on: Feb 22, 2007
By: Education
Revises provisions relating to career and technical education. (BDR 34-441)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Contains Appropriation not included in Executive Budget.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Education     Feb. 21, 2007     03:45 PM    Minutes      Discussed as BDR .
  Assembly Education     Feb. 28, 2007     03:45 PM    Minutes      Do pass .
  Assembly Ways and Means     Mar. 19, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
       
 
Votes
 
Bill Text  As Introduced                                    

Bill History

Feb 22, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Concurrent Committees on Education and Ways and Means. To printer.

Feb 23, 2007

  • From printer. To committees.

Mar 01, 2007

  • From Concurrent Committee on Education: Do pass.
  • To Concurrent Committee on Ways and Means.

Mar 12, 2007

  • Notice of exemption.

Jun 05, 2007

  • (No further action taken.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo