Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB149
Introduced on: Feb 26, 2007
By: Legislative Operations and Elections
Makes various changes to provisions governing elections. (BDR 24-4)
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Mar. 08, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Apr. 12, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      After Passage Discussion .
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     Apr. 26, 2007     03:45 PM    Minutes      No Action .
       
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Apr. 18   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint                                
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 35

Bill History

Feb 26, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Feb 27, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 16, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 17, 2007

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 35.) To printer.

Apr 18, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

Apr 19, 2007

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments. To committee.

May 19, 2007

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo