Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB161
Introduced on: Feb 23, 2007
By: Commerce and Labor
Revises various provisions governing insurance. (BDR 57-586)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 536.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar. 21, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr. 09, 2007     01:00 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Assembly Ways and Means     May. 15, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Ways and Means     May. 17, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Do pass, as amended .
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May. 24, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
       
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    May. 21   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    Jun. 02   Yea 19,   Nay 2,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint     3rd Reprint             As Enrolled        
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 516
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 990
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 1111

Bill History

Feb 23, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Feb 26, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 12, 2007

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 23, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 516.) To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

May 17, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass, as amended.

May 21, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

May 22, 2007

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 29, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 990.) To printer.

May 30, 2007

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.

Jun 02, 2007

  • Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1111.) To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 19, Nays: 2.) To Assembly.

Jun 03, 2007

  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment Nos. 990 and 1111 not concurred in.
  • Action of refusal to concur in Senate Amendment Nos. 990 and 1111 rescinded.
  • Senate Amendment Nos. 990 and 1111 concurred in.
  • To enrollment.

Jun 04, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 15, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 536.
  • Sections 1 and 33 of this act effective July 1, 2007. Sections 1.03 to 32, inclusive, of this act effective October 1, 2007.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo