Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB168
Introduced on: Feb 23, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Buckley , Leslie , Parks , Gerhardt , Conklin , Anderson , Arberry , Atkinson , Beers , Bobzien , Carpenter , Claborn , Denis , Hardy , Hogan , Horne , Kihuen , Kirkpatrick , Koivisto , Manendo , Marvel , McClain , Munford , Oceguera , Ohrenschall , Parnell , Pierce , Segerblom , Smith , Stewart , Womack , Wiener , Washington , Woodhouse
Makes various changes concerning expanding health insurance to make health insurance available to more residents of Nevada. (BDR 38-1144)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Contains Appropriation not included in Executive Budget.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Feb. 26, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Mar. 21, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Finance     Mar. 22, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Discussed in Subcommittee .
  Assembly Ways and Means     May. 08, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
       
 
Votes
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint                                
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 107

Bill History

Feb 23, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Concurrent Committees on Health and Human Services and Ways and Means. To printer.

Feb 26, 2007

  • From printer. To committees.

Mar 12, 2007

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 23, 2007

  • From Concurrent Committee on Health and Human Services: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 107.) To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • To Concurrent Committee on Ways and Means.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 05, 2007

  • (No further action taken.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo