Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB169
Introduced on: Feb 23, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Beers , Hardy , Mabey , Allen , Anderson , Buckley , Carpenter , Christensen , Denis , Goedhart , Goicoechea , Grady , Kihuen , Kirkpatrick , Koivisto , Manendo , McClain , Mortenson , Munford , Oceguera , Ohrenschall , Segerblom , Settelmeyer , Stewart , Womack
Proposes to exempt sales of certain durable medical equipment and mobility-enhancing equipment from sales and use taxes and analogous taxes. (BDR 32-812)
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Senate Taxation     Mar. 29, 2007     01:00 PM    Minutes      Mentioned No Jurisdiction .
  Senate Taxation     Apr. 10, 2007     01:00 PM    Minutes      Mentioned No Jurisdiction .
  Assembly Taxation     Apr. 10, 2007     01:00 PM    Minutes      No Action .
       
 
Votes
 
Bill Text  As Introduced                                    

Bill History

Feb 23, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Feb 26, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 12, 2007

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 14, 2007

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo