Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB176
Introduced on: Feb 26, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Allen , Beers , Mabey , Kirkpatrick , Atkinson , Carpenter , Denis , Goedhart , Goicoechea , Grady , Hardy , Settelmeyer , Care , Titus
Provides for the automatic transfer of ownership of certain vehicles and motorboats to the designated beneficiary on the death of the owner. (BDR 43-425)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 270.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Transportation     Mar. 27, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Transportation and Homeland Security     May. 01, 2007     02:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Transportation and Homeland Security     May. 15, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
       
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr. 16   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May. 24   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint                 As Enrolled        
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 94
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 826

Bill History

Feb 26, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Feb 27, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 12, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 94.) To printer.

Apr 13, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 16, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

Apr 17, 2007

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation and Homeland Security. To committee.

May 22, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 23, 2007

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 826.) To printer.

May 24, 2007

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

May 25, 2007

  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment No. 826 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 28, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 01, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 270.
  • Effective January 31, 2008.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo