Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB14
Introduced on: Jan 18, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Oceguera
Makes various changes to provisions concerning graffiti and other damage to property. (BDR 15-387)
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 442.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Feb. 12, 2007     09:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Judiciary     Feb. 23, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar. 06, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Judiciary     May. 02, 2007     09:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
       
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr. 17   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May. 14   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint     3rd Reprint             As Enrolled        
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 29
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 663
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. CA1

Bill History

Jan 18, 2007

  • Prefiled.
  • Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.
  • From printer.

Feb 05, 2007

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 05, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 09, 2007

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 29.) To printer.

Apr 10, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.

Apr 12, 2007

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

Apr 17, 2007

  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

Apr 18, 2007

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 07, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 08, 2007

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 663.) To printer.

May 09, 2007

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 10, 2007

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 14, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.

May 15, 2007

  • In Assembly.

May 16, 2007

  • Senate Amendment No. 663 not concurred in. To Senate.

May 17, 2007

  • In Senate.

May 22, 2007

  • Senate Amendment No. 663 not receded from. Conference requested. First Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.

May 24, 2007

  • First Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To committee.

May 29, 2007

  • From committee: Concur in Senate Amendment No. 663 and further amend.
  • First Conference report adopted by Assembly.

May 30, 2007

  • First Conference report adopted by Senate.

May 31, 2007

  • To printer.

Jun 01, 2007

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint.
  • To enrollment.

Jun 02, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 13, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor.

Jun 14, 2007

  • Chapter 442.
  • Effective October 1, 2007.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo