Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB155
Introduced on: Feb 26, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Hardy , Heck , Lee
Makes various changes to provisions pertaining to the prosecution of identity theft. (BDR 14-1008)
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Mar. 06, 2007     09:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Judiciary     Apr. 04, 2007     09:00 AM    Minutes      Do pass .
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr. 25, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Judiciary     May. 17, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass, lost .
       
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Apr. 10   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced                                    

Bill History

Feb 26, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Feb 27, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 05, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 09, 2007

  • Read second time.

Apr 10, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

Apr 12, 2007

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 19, 2007

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo