Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB178
Introduced on: Feb 26, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Bobzien , Buckley , Leslie , Pierce , Anderson , Conklin , Horne , Kirkpatrick , Manendo , Oceguera , Parks , Segerblom , Titus
Revises provisions relating to net metering and energy. (BDR 58-1054)
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 510.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar. 05, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar. 23, 2007 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      Not Heard .
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr. 02, 2007     01:00 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May. 08, 2007     07:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May. 15, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May. 29, 2007     04:00 PM    Minutes      Do not recede .
       
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr. 13   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May. 25   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint     3rd Reprint     4th Reprint         As Enrolled        
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 139
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 770
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 1013
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. CA38

Bill History

Feb 26, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Feb 27, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 12, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 139.) To printer.

Apr 13, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

Apr 16, 2007

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 23, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 770.) To printer.

May 24, 2007

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
  • Read third time.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.

May 25, 2007

  • Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1013.) To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

May 26, 2007

  • In Assembly.

May 28, 2007

  • Senate Amendment No. 770 concurred in.
  • Senate Amendment No. 1013 not concurred in. To Senate.

May 29, 2007

  • In Senate.

May 30, 2007

  • Senate Amendment No. 1013 not receded from. Conference requested. First Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To Assembly.

May 31, 2007

  • In Assembly.
  • First Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To committee.

Jun 04, 2007

  • From committee: Concur in Senate Amendment No. 1013 and further amend. First Conference report adopted by Assembly.
  • First Conference report adopted by Senate.
  • To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Fourth reprint.
  • To enrollment.

Jun 07, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 14, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 510.
  • Sections 1.4 to 4, inclusive, and 30 of this act effective June 14, 2007. Sections 1.35 and 29.7 of this act effective: (a) June 14, 2007, for the purposes of appointing additional members to the Task Force for Renewable Energy and Energy Conservation; and (b) July 1, 2007, for all other purposes. Sections 1, 1.3 and 4.5 to 29.5, inclusive, of this act effective: (a) June 14, 2007, for the purposes of adopting regulations and taking such other actions as are necessary to carry out the provisions of this act; and (b) October 1, 2007, for all other purposes. Sections 5 to 29, inclusive, of this act expire by limitation on June 30, 2011, except that if a substantially similar Wind Energy Systems Demonstration Program Act is enacted into law and becomes effective on or before October 1, 2007, sections 5 to 29, inclusive, of this act expire by limitation on the date on which the substantially similar Wind Energy Systems Demonstration Program Act becomes effective.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | Current NELIS | Previous NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2016 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo