Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB180
Introduced on: Feb 26, 2007
By: Judiciary
Increases the amount of community service required for placing graffiti on or otherwise defacing property. (BDR 15-467)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Feb. 26, 2007     09:30 AM    Minutes      Discussed as BDR .
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar. 15, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
       
 
Votes
 
Bill Text  As Introduced                                    

Bill History

Feb 26, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Feb 27, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 14, 2007

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo