Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB181
Introduced on: Feb 27, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Manendo
Revises provisions relating to the survey of labor rates charged by body shops. (BDR 43-456)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 132.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Transportation     Mar. 22, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Transportation     Mar. 29, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Transportation and Homeland Security     May. 10, 2007     02:30 PM    Minutes      Do pass .
       
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr. 19   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May. 17   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint                         As Enrolled        
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 126

Bill History

Feb 27, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Feb 28, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 18, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 126.) To printer.

Apr 19, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

Apr 23, 2007

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation and Homeland Security. To committee.

May 14, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 15, 2007

  • Read second time.

May 16, 2007

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 17, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

May 21, 2007

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 22, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 28, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 132.
  • Sections 1 to 6, inclusive, 8 and 9 of this act become effective on July 1, 2007. Section 6 of this act expires by limitation on the date on which the provisions of 42 U.S.C. § 666 requiring each state to establish procedures under which the state has the authority to withhold or suspend, or to restrict the use of professional, occupational and recreational licenses of persons who: (a) have failed to comply with a subpoena or warrant relating to a proceeding to determine the paternity of a child or to establish or enforce an obligation for the support of a child; or (b) are in arrears in the payment for the support of one or more children, are repealed by the Congress of the United States. Section 7 of this act becomes effective on the date on which the provisions of 42 U.S.C. § 666 requiring each state to establish procedures under which the state has the authority to withhold or suspend, or to restrict the use of professional, occupational and recreational licenses of persons who: (a) have failed to comply with a subpoena or warrant relating to a proceeding to determine the paternity of a child or to establish or enforce an obligation for the support of a child; or (b) are in arrears in the payment for the support of one or more children, are repealed by the Congress of the United States.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo