Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB161
Introduced on: Feb 26, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Coffin , Titus , Beers , Cegavske , Mathews , Raggio , Rhoads
Exempts hybrid electric vehicles, for a certain period, from the program for the control of emissions from motor vehicles. (BDR 40-252)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 231.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Senate Natural Resources     Mar. 19, 2007     03:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Natural Resources     Mar. 21, 2007     03:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Finance     Apr. 16, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Finance     May. 03, 2007     03:00 PM    Minutes      Mentioned Not Agendized .
  Senate Finance     May. 08, 2007 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      Mentioned Not Agendized .
  Senate Finance     May. 14, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Assembly Transportation     May. 24, 2007     02:40 PM    Minutes      Do pass .
       
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    May. 17   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    May. 25   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint                         As Enrolled        
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 722

Bill History

Feb 26, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To printer.

Feb 27, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 18, 2007

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 05, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 09, 2007

  • Taken from Second Reading File. Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

May 15, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 16, 2007

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 722.) To printer.

May 17, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

May 21, 2007

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee.

May 25, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.

May 26, 2007

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 28, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 31, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 231.
  • Effective October 1, 2007.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo