Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB164
Introduced on: Feb 26, 2007
By: Human Resources and Education
Revises provisions governing the Fund for a Healthy Nevada. (BDR 40-95)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Senate Human Resources and Education     Mar. 09, 2007     08:30 AM    Minutes      Not Heard .
  Senate Human Resources and Education     Apr. 09, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Human Resources and Education     May. 23, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      After Passage Discussion .
       
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Apr. 23   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint                                
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 302

Bill History

Feb 26, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Human Resources and Education. To printer.

Feb 27, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 18, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 19, 2007

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 302.) To printer.

Apr 20, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.

Apr 23, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

Apr 24, 2007

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 19, 2007

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo